CO SB013 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Accountability
Title
Workers' Compensation Accountability
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Hodge [D] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-10 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor | |
2010-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-16 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |