CO SB012 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning versions of the Colorado constitution.
Title
Versions Of The Colorado Constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-012 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-012 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-012 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-012 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-18 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |