CO SB012 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Abuse Reporting Youth Sports Organizations
Title
Child Abuse Reporting Youth Sports Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-012 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-012 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-012 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |