CO SB011 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-15)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the establishment of the America 250 - Colorado 150 commission, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

America 250 - Colorado 150 Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-011 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-011 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-011 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-26 Governor Signed
2022-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2022-05-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2022-05-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2022-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2022-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2022-03-24HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2022-03-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
2022-03-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-03-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2022-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2022-02-01SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2022-01-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb22-011
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_011_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_011_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_011_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_011_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_011_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_011_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB011_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB011_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB011_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb011_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb0011_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb0011_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1aa43be0b1202507872587dc0073aebe-sb22-011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1aa43be0b1202507872587dc0073aebe-sb22-011-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1aa43be0b1202507872587dc0073aebe-sb22-011-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8f8ecf0ee47941b9872587fb00555aef-sb22-011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aab9aa96073a1a43872587fb0066d5e0-sb22-011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aab9aa96073a1a43872587fb0066d5e0-sb22-011-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-011vote5ef8e7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8dd6a800ad9ecb2a8725880f0064cd72-sb22-011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/731db3d93995cb9b87258830004e7a5d-sb22-011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-011vote56a8cd

Bill Comments

feedback