CO SB011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning responsibilities of a pharmacist related to opiate antagonists.
Title
Pharmacist Prescribe Dispense Opiate Antagonist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-011 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.014) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-011 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.014) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |