CO SB011 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Terminate Use Of FASTER Fee Revenue For Transit
Title
Terminate Use Of FASTER Fee Revenue For Transit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-011 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-011 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-011 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-011 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |