CO SB011 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Colorado Civil Union Act
Title
Colorado Civil Union Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.020. (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.0016 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.0016 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.020. (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.0016 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.0016 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Re-Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Finance + Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |