CO SB009 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a reproductive health care program, and, in connection therewith, providing contraceptive methods and counseling services to participants and making an appropriation.
Title
Reproductive Health Care Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-009 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-009 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-009 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-009 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |