CO SB008 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning postsecondary education support for certain students who have been in out-of-home placement, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Higher Education Support For Foster Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment E) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment D) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment E) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment D) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-14 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |