CO SB006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an electronic sales and use tax simplification system, and, in connection therewith, requiring the office of information technology to conduct a sourcing method for the development of the system and requiring the department of revenue to establish the implementation of the system for the acceptance of returns and processing of payments for the sales and use tax levied by the state and any local taxing jurisdictions, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Sales And Use Tax Simplification System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.006) (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12 Governor Signed
2019-04-03 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-19SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-03-14HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-11HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2019-01-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-22SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-006
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_006_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_006_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_006_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_006_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_006_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_006_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b89b6d07f2deb8a88725838a0073a04f-sb19-006-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-006vote6573de
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b89b6d07f2deb8a88725838a0073a04f-sb19-006-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b89b6d07f2deb8a88725838a0073a04f-sb19-006-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd06343e51eb6e6c8725839e0073f442-sb19-006-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd06343e51eb6e6c8725839e0073f442-sb19-006-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c0792d91c0f6280f872583b70052fd14-sb19-006-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-006vote5570db
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-006vote553aa3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-006vote55586f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-006vote566400
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-006vote565040

Bill Comments

feedback