CO SB005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning wholesale importation of prescription pharmaceutical products from Canada for resale to Colorado residents, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Import Prescription Drugs From Canada

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.027) (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment P). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-03-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-31SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-005
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_005_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_005_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_005_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_005_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_005_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_005_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-9-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-10-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e44cc2372b7a703f87258393007f267f-sb19-005-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/15d99f7be624a0d0872583c2004bd7ff-sb19-005-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/15d99f7be624a0d0872583c2004bd7ff-sb19-005-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-005vote6c1c26
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fc216c9e10ca1ef1872583e6006c7873-sb19-005-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5bf04c777563a607872583ed004d8b99-sb19-005-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5bf04c777563a607872583ed004d8b99-sb19-005-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5bf04c777563a607872583ed004d8b99-sb19-005-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5bf04c777563a607872583ed004d8b99-sb19-005-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-005vote7b0124
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-005vote7aeca3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-005vote7b16b8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-005vote17ea07
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-005vote17d1bf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fc216c9e10ca1ef1872583e6006c7873-sb19-005-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback