CO SB005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning wholesale importation of prescription pharmaceutical products from Canada for resale to Colorado residents, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Import Prescription Drugs From Canada
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.027) (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment P). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.027) (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment P). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |