CO SB003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the educator loan forgiveness program to address educator shortages, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educator Loan Forgiveness Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
2019-03-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-24SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-003
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_003_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_003_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_003_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_003_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_003_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7bfaf0d8ec69ad0c8725838c00715ec7-sb19-003-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ffe8cebed9740b61872583c2004bb817-sb19-003-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ffe8cebed9740b61872583c2004bb817-sb19-003-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-003vote01a54d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-003vote13a8af
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7bfaf0d8ec69ad0c8725838c00715ec7-sb19-003-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7bfaf0d8ec69ad0c8725838c00715ec7-sb19-003-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7bfaf0d8ec69ad0c8725838c00715ec7-sb19-003-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f4f8e8aecee4c36a872583d000728018-sb19-003-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/875f1faeb339b702872583de004d5392-sb19-003-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-003vote55aa25

Bill Comments

feedback