CO HR1008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the designation of a portion of Colorado State Highway 470 between Mileposts 7 and 15 as the "Dave Sanders Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Dave Sanders Memorial Highway

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback