CO HR1001 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning employees and positions for the House of Representatives convened in the Second Regular Session of the Seventy-first General Assembly.
Title
House Employees and Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-01-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-10 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 01/12/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |