CO HJR1032 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Jt Rule 36 Lobbyist Complaint Procedure
Title
Jt Rule 36 Lobbyist Complaint Procedure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-06-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-10 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2010-05-05 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/28748361C14288AC8725770E00734E75?Open |