CO HJR1027 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the declaration of April 23, 2017, through April 29, 2017, as 'Holocaust Awareness Week'.
Title
Holocaust Awareness Week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |