CO HJR1026 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning designating April 2017 as 'Second Chance Month'.
Title
Second Chance Month
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Wist [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Rhonda Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2017-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |