CO HJR1025 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Summary
Cost-effective Nutrient Regs In CO Water
Title
Cost-effective Nutrient Regs In CO Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2011-05-10 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47AA5E17F47787D18725787600595B70?Open |