CO HJR1018 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Preserve Agricultural Water Supplies
Title
Preserve Agricultural Water Supplies
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Saine [R] | Rep. Jon Becker [R] | Sen. Vicki Marble [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/05/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |