CO HJR1017 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designate A National Day Of The Cowboy
Title
Designate A National Day Of The Cowboy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2015-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-30 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-03-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |