CO HJR1016 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-29)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning recognition of Military, Veterans, and MIA/POW Appreciation Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Appreciation Day

Sponsors

Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Don Wilson [R]Sen. Kyle Mullica [D]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]
Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Ryan Armagost [R]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]
Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]Rep. Scott Bottoms [R]Rep. Mary Bradfield [R]
Rep. Brandi Bradley [R]Rep. Kyle Brown [D]Rep. Marc Catlin [R]Rep. Lindsey Daugherty [D]
Rep. Ken Degraaf [R]Rep. Ruby Dickson [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Regina English [D]
Rep. Gabe Evans [R]Rep. Lisa Frizell [R]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Lorena Garcia [D]
Rep. Eliza Hamrick [D]Rep. Anthony Hartsook [R]Rep. Richard Holtorf [R]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]
Rep. Junie Joseph [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Sheila Lieder [D]Rep. Mandy Lindsay [D]
Rep. William Lindstedt [D]Rep. Stephanie Luck [R]Rep. Meghan Lukens [D]Rep. Michael Lynch [R]
Rep. Javier Mabrey [D]Rep. Bob Marshall [D]Rep. Matthew Martinez [D]Rep. Tisha Mauro [D]
Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]
Rep. Jennifer Parenti [D]Rep. Rose Pugliese [R]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Said Sharbini [D]
Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Tammy Story [D]
Rep. Rick Taggart [R]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Stephanie Vigil [D]
Rep. Ron Weinberg [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Jenny Willford [D]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]
Rep. Mary Young [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Sen. Mark Baisley [R]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]
Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. Lisa Cutter [D]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]
Sen. Thomas Exum [D]Sen. Steve Fenberg [D]Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Bob Gardner [R]
Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Nick Hinrichsen [D]
Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]
Sen. Janice Marchman [D]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Rod Pelton [R]Sen. Byron Pelton [R]
Sen. Kevin Priola [D]Sen. Janice Rich [R]Sen. Dylan Roberts [D]Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]Sen. Kevin Van Winkle [R]Sen. Perry Will [R]Sen. Faith Winter [D]
Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]

Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-02-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2023-02-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-02-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback