CO HJR1015 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-37)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-37)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of a portion of Colorado State Highway 115 as the "CW3 Scott A. M. Oswell Memorial Highway".
Title
Designate CW3 Scott A. M. Oswell Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 65) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 65) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/18/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |