CO HJR1014 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-37)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-37)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of a portion of Colorado State Highway 21 from Kettle Creek to Woodmen Road in El Paso County as the "SFC Will Lindsay Memorial Highway".
Title
Sergeant First Class Will Lindsay Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2022-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |