CO HJR1014 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the declaration of April 28, 2019, through May 5, 2019, as "Holocaust Awareness Week".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holocaust Awareness Week

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2019 - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2019-04-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback