CO HJR1011 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of U.S. Highway 85-87 from Interstate 25 to Comanche Village Drive as the "Reverend James H. McMearn Memorial Highway".
Title
Reverend James H McMearn Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2018-02-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/16/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |