CO HJR1007 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-37)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-37)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the appointment of Kerri L. Hunter to the position of state auditor.
Title
Kerri L. Hunter As New State Auditor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2021-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |