CO HJR1005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning water projects eligibility lists.
Title
Water Projects Eligibility Lists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Referred to Full Senate for final action and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Joint Resolution 19-1005 to the Full House (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Referred to Full Senate for final action and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Joint Resolution 19-1005 to the Full House (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2019-01-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-17 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |