CO HJR1004 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a Joint Session of the House of Representatives and the Senate for the purpose of hearing a message from the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court, and appointing a committee to escort the Chief Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Of The Judiciary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-01-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-01-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-01-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2023-01-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-01-09HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback