CO HJR1002 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-16)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning approval of water project revolving fund eligibility lists administered by the Colorado water resources and power development authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Projects Eligibility Lists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer to the Full House (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-02-18HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback