CO HJR1002 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dam Restoration Access To Federal Lands
Title
Dam Restoration Access To Federal Lands
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Joint Resolution 16-1002, as amended, to the House of Representatives (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Joint Resolution 16-1002, as amended, to the House of Representatives (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-01-27 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |