CO HJM1001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Senator William L. Armstrong.
Title
Memorializing Former Senator William L. Armstrong
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Memorial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Adopt Memorial (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Adopt Memorial (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |