CO HB1432 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Personnel Files Employee Inspection Right
Title
Personnel Files Employee Inspection Right
Sponsors
Sen. Faith Winter [D] | Sen. Andy Kerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E), as conceptually amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to amendment L.005, page 1, line 2, strike "defined" and substitute "determined" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E), as conceptually amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to amendment L.005, page 1, line 2, strike "defined" and substitute "determined" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E), as conceptually amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to amendment L.005, page 1, line 2, strike "defined" and substitute "determined" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E), as conceptually amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to amendment L.005, page 1, line 2, strike "defined" and substitute "determined" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2016-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |