CO HB1428 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for an investor-owned utility to enter into a collaboration agreement with a community, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Authorize Utility Community Collaboration Contract
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1428 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.007) (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.007) (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1428, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |