CO HB1427 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the taxation of products that contain nicotine, and, in connection therewith, incrementally increasing the cigarette tax and the tobacco products tax; expanding both of these taxes to apply to sales to consumers from outside of the state; creating an inventory tax that applies when the cigarette tax increases; creating a minimum tax amount for moist snuff tobacco products; creating a tax on nicotine products that is equal to the total tax on tobacco products; establishing new rates for cigarettes, tobacco products, and nicotine products that are modified risk tobacco products that are half of the statutory tax; referring a ballot issue for prior voter approval for the new and increased taxes; and allocating the new tax revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarette Tobacco And Nicotine Products Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1427 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1427, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.012) (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1427 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1427 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Governor Signed
2020-07-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-07-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-07-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1427
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1427_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1427_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1427_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1427_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1427_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1427_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/414e8a2f07e35d0087258584006d097e-hb20-1427-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dd9d7296c6206a4c87258584007da1aa-hb20-1427-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1427vote0ee858
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1427vote0ec26f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1427vote0ea8e2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/473e2ddc721ecb2687258586001a9306-hb20-1427-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/653394417e8fe4f68725858600506340-hb20-1427-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1427vote0c40e9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1427vote5c77d9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1427vote6b8fb5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1427vote6b6fbd

Bill Comments

feedback