CO HB1422 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning requirements for marijuana testing facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana Testing Facilities Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1422, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Strip funding amd (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1422 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1422, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1422, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06 Governor Signed
2018-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-09SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-05-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-05-04SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2018-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1422
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1422_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1422_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1422_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1422_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1422_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1422_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-04-30t133421z-hb18-1422-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-hb18-1422-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-04-30t133421z-hb18-1422-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-hb18-1422-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1422vote557948
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-05-04t150212z-hb18-1422-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-05-07t134156z-hb18-1422-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-05-07t134156z-hb18-1422-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1422vote6b6084
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1422vote838939
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1422vote8370e7

Bill Comments

feedback