CO HB1421 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning delinquent interest payments for property tax payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delinquent Interest Payments Property Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-14 Governor Signed
2020-06-13 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-09HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1421
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1421_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1421_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1421_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1421_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1421_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1421_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f4aaea37aba1a7587258582007618eb-hb20-1421-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1421vote54bdd6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8e82ba6ddd281ea987258584006f09ff-hb20-1421-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1421vote55be57

Bill Comments

feedback