CO HB1420 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

CO Healthcare Affordability & Sustainability Enter

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CO Healthcare Affordability & Sustainability Enter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1420 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1420 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1420 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1420 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1420, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10SenateSenate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2016-05-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2016-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-03-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/16D59DF343435AA487257F2400641439?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/16D59DF343435AA487257F2400641439/$FILE/1420_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/16D59DF343435AA487257F2400641439/$FILE/1420app_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/16D59DF343435AA487257F2400641439/$FILE/1420_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/16D59DF343435AA487257F2400641439/$FILE/1420_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F43ECDA745AA5AE687257F850065BF53
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8375BD7CB26242C687257F8500656FDC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5A400B16E190199987257F8500674C30
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/F6EFFCE2731193E987257FA3005ED0C5/$FILE/Ap28.pdf#1077
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/F6EFFCE2731193E987257FA3005ED0C5/$FILE/Ap28.pdf#1078
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/A5A4B27BFFFF997D87257FA40059C73A/$FILE/Ap29.pdf#1110
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1D6965AA4AA2E92787257FAF0073CFA0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7787E3A2D5F9816987257FAF0073C481
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1D6965AA4AA2E92787257FAF0073CFA0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7787E3A2D5F9816987257FAF0073C481

Bill Comments

feedback