CO HB1420 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Collect Driver Improvement Penalty
Title
Collect Driver Improvement Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1420, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2010-05-05 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |