CO HB1419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additional safety requirements for oil and gas operators, and, in connection therewith, requiring the disclosure of the location of subsurface facilities and the sharing of oil and gas operators' development plans with affected local governments and requiring rules regarding wellhead integrity.
Title
Oil Gas Operators Disclosures Wellhead Integrity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1419 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1419 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment K]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1419, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1419 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment K]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1419, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |