CO HB1417 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of alcohol beverages, and, in connection therewith, creating an alcohol beverage regulation task force.
Title
Alcohol Beverages Task Force And Retailer Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1417 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1417, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1417, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1417, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1417, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1417, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1417, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2022-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |