CO HB1415 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a worker's rights in the workplace for conduct related to a principal's actions during a public health emergency, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Whistleblower Protection Public Health Emergencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1415 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1415, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1415, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1415, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1415 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1415, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1415, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1415, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-11 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |