CO HB1413 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-14)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-14)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authority for the executive committee of the legislative council to allow remote testimony before legislative committees, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Remote Testimony Before Legislative Committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1413 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1413, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1413, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1413 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1413 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1413, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1413, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1413 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |