CO HB1412 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the division of gaming in the department of revenue, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2021 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Division Of Gaming
Sponsors
Rep. Alec Garnett [D] | Sen. Kevin Van Winkle [R] | Sen. John Cooke [R] | Rep. Judith Amabile [D] |
Sen. Dylan Roberts [D] | Rep. Cathy Kipp [D] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Dave Williams [R] |
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1412 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1412 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1412 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1412 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1412, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2022-04-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |