CO HB1412 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning assistance for individuals unable to pay their utility bills due to economic hardship caused by the COVID-19 pandemic, and, in connection therewith, transferring money received from the federal government pursuant to the "CARES Act" to the energy outreach Colorado low-income energy assistance fund to provide such assistance.
Title
COVID-19 Utility Bill Payment-related Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1412, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1412 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1412, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1412 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1412 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1412, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1412 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1412, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1412 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1412 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-05 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |