CO HB1409 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning department of public health and environment inspections of penal institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDPHE Inspections Of Penal Institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1409 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1409 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-07-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-07-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-06-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-05HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1409
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1409_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1409_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1409_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1409_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1409_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1409_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/74675902fa4723908725857e00803a3f-hb20-1409-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1409vote55be34
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/73a3224cde364a618725858300601c98-hb20-1409-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1409vote638798

Bill Comments

feedback