CO HB1408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the appropriation for controlled maintenance projects, including controlled maintenance projects that are capital renewal projects, of any proceeds from the Senate Bill 17-267 lease-purchase agreement that will be executed in state fiscal year 2019-20 that are credited to the capital construction fund as a result of House Bill 20-1377.
Title
Distribution Of HB20-1377 Capital Construction Fund Money
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1408 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Governor Signed | |
2020-07-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-07-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |