CO HB1402 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to promote responsible gaming, and, in connection therewith, creating the responsible gaming grant program, establishing funding mechanisms to support the grant program, and making an appropriation.
Title
Responsible Gaming Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.003) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1402 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1402, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1402 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.003) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1402 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1402, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1402 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |