CO HB1402 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nonsubstantive revision of statutes in the Colorado Revised Statutes, as amended, and, in connection therewith, amending or repealing obsolete, imperfect, and inoperative law to preserve the legislative intent, effect, and meaning of the law.
Title
Revisor's Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1402 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1402 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1402 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1402 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-03 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |