CO HB1401 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the preparedness of health facilities to meet patient needs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Hospital Nurse Staffing Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1401 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1401 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Refer (2nd) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Lo (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment P). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment O). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment N). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment M). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment L). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment K). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1401 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1401 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Refer (2nd) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Lo (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment P). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment O). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment N). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment M). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment L). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment K). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1401, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2022-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |